Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|