Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Kerbs |