House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/01/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|