House
|
05/25/2023
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 77 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Vetoed 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Newton, Grego, Maynard, Burns
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kerbs
|
|
|