Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Remove Representative Kerbs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pittman | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Kerbs |