Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Adoption of floor substitute rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|