Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2005 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023