House
|
05/15/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Davis
|
|
|