Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 33 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Matthews (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Nichols |