Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Grego, Smith, Sneed, Randleman, Humphrey, Dobrinski, West (Josh), Patzkowsky, Cantrell, Townley, West (Kevin), Ford | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Woods (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hardin |