Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2052 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023