Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad), Fugate | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Remove Representative Caldwell (Chad) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Archer | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |