Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Pae |