Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 22 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative George |