Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023