Senate | 04/05/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 15 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |