Senate | 04/11/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Menz | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |