House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Remove Representative West (Kevin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Stark
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|