Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2238 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
2-HB2238 HFLR Page 1
3-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.
4- 1
2+Req. No. 7867 Page 1 1
53 2
64 3
75 4
86 5
97 6
108 7
119 8
1210 9
1311 10
1412 11
1513 12
1614 13
1715 14
1816 15
1917 16
2018 17
2119 18
2220 19
2321 20
2422 21
2523 22
2624 23
2725 24
2826
29-HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION
30-
3127 STATE OF OKLAHOMA
3228
3329 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023)
3430
3531 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE
3632 FOR
37-HOUSE BILL NO. 2238 By: Ford of the House
38-
39- and
40-
41- Montgomery of the Senate
42-
43-
33+HOUSE BILL NO. 2238 By: Ford
4434
4535
4636
4737 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE
4838
4939 An Act relating to public health; amending 63 O.S.
5040 2021, Section 1-229.35, which relates to vapor
5141 product reporting; modifying compliance deadlines;
5242 and declaring an emergency .
5343
5444
5545
5646
57-
58-
5947 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA:
6048 SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 63 O.S. 2021, Section 1-229.35, as
6149 amended by Section 1, Chapter 95, O.S.L. 2022 (63 O.S. Supp. 2022,
6250 Section 1-229.35), is amended to read as follows:
6351 Section 1-229.35 A. Beginning July 1, 2023 2024, every
6452 manufacturer of a vapor product that is sold or inte nded to be sold
6553 in this state, whether directly or through a di stributor, retailer,
6654 or similar intermediary or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver
6755 an attestation under penalty o f perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic
68-HB2238 HFLR Page 2
69-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.
70- 1
56+Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Comm ission certifying that, as of
57+the date of such attestation:
58+1. The vapor product was available for purchase in the United
59+States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applie d for a
60+marketing order for the vap or product by submitting a Premarket
61+Req. No. 7867 Page 2 1
7162 2
7263 3
7364 4
7465 5
7566 6
7667 7
7768 8
7869 9
7970 10
8071 11
8172 12
8273 13
8374 14
8475 15
8576 16
8677 17
8778 18
8879 19
8980 20
9081 21
9182 22
9283 23
9384 24
9485
95-Beverage Laws Enforcement (ABLE) Commission certifying that, as of
96-the date of such attestation:
97-1. The vapor product was available for purchase in the United
98-States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applie d for a
99-marketing order for the vap or product by submitting a Premarket
10086 Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to t he
10187 United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or
10288 2. The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other
10389 authorization for the vapor product fr om the FDA pursuant to Section
10490 387j of Title 21 of the United States Code.
10591 B. The manufacturer shall notify the ABLE Commission within
10692 thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation,
10793 including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or
10894 other authorization or has or dered the manufacturer to remove the
10995 vapor product, either temp orarily or permanently, from the United
11096 States market.
11197 C. The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of
11298 the manufacturers that have provide d attestations that comply with
11399 subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed
114100 in such attestations. The ABLE Commission shall:
115101 1. Make the directory available for public inspection on its
116102 website on or before October 1, 2023 2024; and
117-HB2238 HFLR Page 3
118-BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.
119- 1
103+2. Update the directory as necessa ry to correct mistakes and to
104+add or remove manufacturers or va por products to maintain the
105+directory in conformity with the requirements of this section.
106+D. It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly ,
107+to knowingly manufacture, distribute , sell, barter, or furnish in
108+this state any vapor product that is not included in the directory.
109+Req. No. 7867 Page 3 1
120110 2
121111 3
122112 4
123113 5
124114 6
125115 7
126116 8
127117 9
128118 10
129119 11
130120 12
131121 13
132122 14
133123 15
134124 16
135125 17
136126 18
137127 19
138128 20
139129 21
140130 22
141131 23
142132 24
143133
144-2. Update the directory as necessary to correct mistakes and to
145-add or remove manufacturers or va por products to maintain the
146-directory in conformity with the requirements of this section.
147-D. It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly ,
148-to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter, or furnish in
149-this state any vapor product that is not included in the directory.
150134 SECTION 2. It being immediately necessary for the preservation
151135 of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby
152136 declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and
153137 be in full force from and after its passage and approval.
154138
155-COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 03/01/2023 - DO PASS,
156-As Amended and Coauthored.
139+59-1-7867 LRB 03/01/2023
140+
141+