Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2265 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023