Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Lepak |