Oklahoma 2023 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2315 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/11/2023

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2315 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 10, 2023 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2315 	By: Hilbert of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Gollihare of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; amending 68 
O.S. 2021, Sections 6504, 6506 and 6508 , which relate 
to the Driving on Road Infrastructure with Vehicles 
of Electricity Act of 2021; modifying provisions 
related to determination of tax rate; modifying 
reporting date for tax; modifying requirements with 
respect to the Oklahoma Tax Commission ; eliminating 
requirement for certain administrative rules; and 
providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S . 2021, Section 6504, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6504.  A.  There is hereby imposed a tax of three cents 
($0.03) per kilowatt hour or its equivalent, as determined by the 
Oklahoma Tax Corporation Commission, on the electric current used to 
charge or recharge the battery or batteries of an electric vehicle.  
The tax shall be levied beginning January 1, 2024. 
B.  The amount of tax prescribed or authorized by this section 
shall not include any fees or charges associated with the method for   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2315 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
payment for the charging service, but shall be based only upon the 
rate of tax and the electricity transferred during the charging 
process. 
C. The tax imposed pursuant to this section shall not be 
applicable to electric vehicles charged at a private residence at 
which the owner or occupant of the residence uses electric powe r 
paid for by the owner or occupant of the residence which is suppl ied 
to the residence by a regulated public utility, an electric 
cooperative or other wholesale level of electric supply, wheth er or 
not supplemented by electric power produced by the owner or occupant 
using solar energy or other methods to provide electric power to the 
residence. 
D.  The tax imposed pursuant to this section shall not be 
applicable to electr ic vehicles charged at charging stations with a 
charging capacity of less than fifty ( 50) kilowatts and charging 
stations that do not require payment fo r use. 
E.  In order to determine an equivalent measurement as required 
in subsection A of this section, the Oklahoma Tax Corporation 
Commission shall promulgate rules that allow businesses, base d on 
the average cost that such business charged customers at the 
business's charging stations in the preceding year, to charge the 
tax on a percentage basis equivalent to the am ount of tax that would 
otherwise have been charged had the rate provided in su bsection A of 
this section been applied in the preceding year.  The percentage   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2315 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
basis equivalent shall be recalculated annually in conjuncti on with 
the Oklahoma Tax Corporation Commission.  Businesses with multiple 
charging station locations in the state sh all be authorized to 
utilize the same percentage basis equivalent a t all such locations. 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 6506, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6506. A.  The tax imposed pursuant to the provision s of 
Section 4 6503 of this act title shall be remitted monthly by each 
charging station owner or operator.  The tax shall b e remitted using 
such forms as the Oklahoma Tax Commission may pr escribe for that 
purpose. 
B.  The tax and any required report shall be filed with the Tax 
Commission not later than the twentieth twenty-seventh day of the 
month following the month during which the electric charging for an 
electric vehicle occurred. 
C.  The charging station owner or op erator shall separately 
state on any invoice or billing document provided to the customer 
the amount of the tax imposed pur suant to Section 4 6503 of this act 
title and shall not include the tax amount in the total amount 
billed to the customer. 
D.  The provisions of this section shall not p rohibit a charging 
station owner or operator from imposing a fee or charge in addition 
to the kilowatt hour or other equivalent unit of mea surement for the 
transfer of electric power to an electric vehicle.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2315 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  Legacy chargers shal l be exempt from remittin g the tax 
levied in this section until November 1, 2041. 
F.  Public charging stations that have ne ver charged a fee for 
their use shall be exempt from remitting the tax levied in this 
section until November 1, 2041. 
SECTION 3.     AMENDATORY     68 O.S. 2021, Section 6508, is 
amended to read as follows: 
Section 6508. A.  Except for charging stations with a charging 
capacity of less than fifty (50) kilowatts, and charging s tations 
that do not require pay ment for use, all charging stations in 
operation prior to the effective date of this act shall regist er 
with the Oklahoma Tax Commission not later than January 31, 2024.  
The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall provide or make avai lable updated 
registration information to the Oklahoma Corpora tion Commission. 
B.  For a charging station which requires payment for its use 
and begins operations for the first time on or after November 1, 
2021, the charging station owner or operator shall register with the 
Oklahoma Tax Commission not later than fift een (15) days after the 
date as of which the first business operations at the station site 
begin or by January 31, 2024, whichever is later. 
C.  Any public charging station for an electric vehic le 
constructed or which begins operations for the first time o n or 
after November 1, 2021, shall use a metering system that is capab le 
of imposing the cost for the charging service using a unit per   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2315 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
kilowatt hour or an equivalent measurement as determined by the Tax 
Oklahoma Corporation Commission, such as time elapsed whi le charging 
and the charging capacity of the charging station, or such as the 
process described in subsection E of Section 1 6504 of this act 
title. The metering system shall include a system by which an audit 
of the electricity supplied t hrough the system may be performed to 
determine the amount of electricity transferred to a customer and 
the cost charged by the charging station owner or operator f or each 
unit of electricity transferred. 
D.  The Oklahoma Tax Commission shall have the auth ority to 
inspect the premises and equipment of any charging station owner or 
operator to enforce compliance with the provisions of this section. 
E.  If a charging station owner or operator fails to remit the 
tax as required by the provisions of this act, t he Oklahoma Tax 
Commission shall begin proceedings to terminate the charging station 
owner or operator license to do business for failure to remit in the 
same manner as prescribed by law for failure to remit sales tax. 
SECTION 4.  This act shall become eff ective November 1, 2023. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON FINANCE 
April 10, 2023 - DO PASS