Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 25, 2023