House | 02/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Prieto (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Tedford | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |