Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023