Senate | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Hicks (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |