ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2373 By: Kannady of the House and Howard of the Senate [ The Governmental Tort Claims Act - limits of liability - effective date ] BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 51 O.S. 2021, Section 154, is amended to read as follows: Section 154. A. The total liability of the state and its political subdivisions on claims within t he scope of The Governmental Tort Claims Act, arising out of an accident or occurrence happening after October 1, 1985, Section 151 et seq. of this title, shall not exceed: 1. Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($25,000.00) The actual amount of loss for any claim or to any claimant who has more than one claim for loss of property arising out of a single act, accident, or occurrence; 2. Except as otherwise provided in this paragraph, One Hundred Twenty-five Thousand Dollars ($125,000.00) Three Hundred Seventy - ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 five Thousand Dollars ($375,000.00) to any claimant for a claim for any other loss arising out of a single act, accident, or occurrence. The limit of liability for the state or any city or county with a population of three hundred thousand (300,000) or more according to the latest Federal Decennial Census, or a political subdivision as defined in subparagraph s of paragraph 11 of Section 152 of this title, shall not exceed One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000.00) Five Hundred Thousand Dollars ( $500,000.00). Except however, the limits of the liability for the University Hospitals and State Mental Health Hospitals opera ted by the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services for claims arising from medical negligence shall be Two Hundred Thousand Dollars ($200,000.00) Three Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($350, 000.00). For claims arising from medical negligence by any licensed physician, osteopathic physician or certified nurse-midwife rendering prenatal, delivery or infant care services from September 1, 1991, through June 30, 1996, pursuant to a contract auth orized by subsection B of Section 1 -106 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes and in conformity with t he requirements of Section 1 -233 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes, the limits of the liability shall be Two Hundred Thousand Dollars ($200,000.00) Three Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($350,000.00) ; or ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 3. One Million Dollars ($1,000,000.00) Two Million Dollars ($2,000,000.00) for any number of claims arising out of a single occurrence or accident. B. 1. Beginning on May 28, 2003, claims shall be allow ed for wrongful criminal felony conviction resulting in imprisonment if the claimant has received a fu ll pardon on the basis of a written finding by the Governor of actual innocence for th e crime for which the claimant was sentenced or has been granted jud icial relief absolving the claimant of guilt on the basis of actual innocence of the crime for which t he claimant was sentenced. The Governor or the court shall specifically state, in the pardon or order, the evidence or basis on which the finding of actu al innocence is based. 2. As used in paragraph 1 of this subsection, for a claimant to recover based on "actual innocence", the individual must meet the following criteria: a. the individual was charged, by indictment or information, with the commission o f a public offense classified as a felony, b. the individual did not plead guilty to the offense charged, or to any lesser included offense, but was convicted of the offense, c. the individual was sentenced to incarceration for a term of imprisonment as a result of the conviction, ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 d. the individual was imprisoned solely on the basis of the conviction for t he offense, and e. (1) in the case of a pardon, a determination was made by either the Pardon and Parole Board or the Governor that the offense for which the individual was convicted, sentenced and imprisoned, including any lesser offenses, was not committed by the individual, or (2) in the case of judicial relief, a court of competent jurisdiction found by clear and convincing evidence that the offense for which the individual was convicted, sentenced and imprisoned, including any lesser included offenses, was not committed by the individual and issued an order vacating, dismissing or rever sing the conviction and sentence and providing that no further proceedings can be or will be held against the individual on any facts and circumstances alleged in the pro ceedings which had resulted in the conviction. 3. A claimant shall not be entitled to compensation for any part of a sentence in prison during which the claimant was also serving a concurrent sentence for a crime not covered by this subsection. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 4. The total liability of the state and its political subdivisions on any claim within the scop e of The Governmental Tort Claims Act arising out of wrongful crimin al felony conviction resulting in imprisonment shall not exceed One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000.00) Three Hundred Thousand Doll ars ($300,000.00). 5. The provisions of this subsection shall apply to convictions occurring on or before Ma y 28, 2003, as well as convictions occurring after May 28, 2003. If a court of competent jurisdiction finds that retroactive application of this subsection is unconstitutional, the prospective application of this subsection shall remain valid. C. No award for damages in an action or any claim against the state or a political subdivision shall include pun itive or exemplary damages. D. When the amount awarded to or settled upon multiple claimants exceeds the limitations of this secti on, any party may apply to the district court which has jurisdiction of the cause to apportion to each claimant the claimant 's proper share of the total amount as limited herein. The share apportioned to each claimant shall be in the proportion that the r atio of the award or se ttlement made to him each claimant bears to the aggregate awards and settlements for all claims agains t the state or its political subdivisions arising out of the occurrence. When the amount of the ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 aggregate losses presented by a single claimant exceeds the limits of paragraph 1 or 2 of subsection A of this section, each person suffering a loss shall be e ntitled to that person 's proportionate share. E. The total liability of resident physicians and interns while participating in a graduate medica l education program of the University of Oklahoma College of Medicine, its affiliated institutions and the Okla homa State University College of Osteopathic Medicine and Surgery shall not exceed One Hundred Thousand Dollars ($100,000.00) One Hundred Seventy-five Thousand Dollars ($175,000.00) . F. The state or a political subdiv ision may petition the court that all parties and actions arising out of a single accident or occurrence shall be joined as provided by law, and upon order of the court the proceedings upon go od cause shown shall be continued for a reasonable time or until such joinder has been completed. The state or political subdivision shall be allowed to interplead in any action which may impose on it any duty or liability pursuant to The Governmental Tort Claims Act. G. The liability of the state or political subdiv ision under The Governmental Tort Clai ms Act shall be several from that of any other person or entity, and the state or political subdivision shall only be liable for that percentage of total damages that corresponds to its percentage of total negligence. Nothing in this section ENGR. H. B. NO. 2373 Page 7 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 shall be construed as increasing the liability limits imposed on the state or political subdivision under The Governmental Tort Claims Act. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. Passed the House of Representatives the 14th day of March, 2023. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2023. Presiding Officer of th e Senate