Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Thompson (Roger), Treat, McCortney, Daniels, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kannady
|
|
|