Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Kannady |