Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023