Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 29 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative May |