House
|
04/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|