Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Banning | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hill |