House
|
05/26/2023
|
Pocket veto 06/12/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants, Hefner, Roe, Talley
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|