Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Williams | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Humphrey |