House
|
04/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative George
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|