Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative ODonnell |