Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 17 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Woods (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative ODonnell, McBride |