House
|
04/26/2023
|
Vetoed 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|