Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass State Powers Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to State Powers | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Steagall |