House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stanley
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Remove Senator Stanley as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Stanley, Pugh, Seifried, Green, Murdock, Thompson (Kristen), Hicks
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
remove as principal author Representative West (Josh) and substitute with Representative Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Remove Representative Steagall as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|