Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy), Wolfley, Waldron | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Baker |