Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Kendrix |