Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Deck | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hefner |