House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kirt (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens, Schreiber
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Miller
|
|
|