House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|