Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Pittman | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Blancett |