Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023