Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1000 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023