House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |